judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

INT'L FIDELITY VS. MUNI. CT. (CITY OF LAS VEGAS)

Case Information: 42109
Short Caption:INT'L FIDELITY VS. MUNI. CT. (CITY OF LAS VEGAS)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Wadhams & Akridge P.C.--check no. 23351.
09/30/2003Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 03-16275
10/27/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 03-17914
12/01/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. 03-19976
12/01/2003Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Opposition/Answer to International Fidelity Insurance Company and Blackjack Bonding, Inc.'s Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 03-19977
12/16/2003Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition for Writ. 03-20930
12/17/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notification of Further Proceedings in Las Vegas Municipal Court. 03-21021
02/09/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Attorney General: Certification of Constitutional Issue. The answer to the writ petiton in this matter draws into question the constitutionality of NRS 5.030(3)(c). 04-02426
03/29/2004MotionFiled Motion. Request for an Order Staying Forfeiture Proceedings Exceeding $2,500 in Municpal Courts Pending Petitioners' Writ of Prohibition. 04-05873
04/07/2004MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Request to Stay Proceedings. 04-06437
04/14/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Opposition to Request to Stay Proceedings. 04-06898
06/14/2004MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. 04-10865
06/15/2004OtherOther. Filed Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Petition for a Writ of Prohibition. 04-10971
07/23/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Deanne M. Rymarowicz associates with Wadhams & Akridge as counsel for appellant. 04-13481
12/03/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition. Order Dismissing Petition for Writ of Prohibition. "We dismiss this petition." fn4[in light of this order, we deny petitioners' March 29, 2004 motion to stay forfeiture proceedings exceeding $2,500, and petitioners' June 14, 2004 motion to file a reply in support of the stay motion.] SNP04D-RR/WM/MD 04-22039
12/29/2004RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 04-22387
12/29/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.