judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MUNSHELL VS. MUNSHELL

Case Information: 42108
Short Caption:MUNSHELL VS. MUNSHELLCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35640 , 40075
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D211277Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/24/2003How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/30/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-16271
10/06/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. D211277: 30 days. fn2[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 03-16547
10/20/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Timothy Steward Munshell--check no. 4702.
10/24/2003Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols.1 and 2. 03-17836
10/24/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/15/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We order the judgment of the district court affirmed." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-20907
11/30/2004Other Returned Mail. Order filed 11/15/04 addressed to Timothy Munshell remailed to corrected address.
12/10/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-21195
12/10/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 13, 2004. 04-21195