judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ZESSMAN (ERIC) VS. STATE (CIVIL)

Case Information: 42105
Short Caption:ZESSMAN (ERIC) VS. STATE (CIVIL)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37718 , 38123 , 38124 , 38159 , 38681 , 39162 , 40071 , 40707 , 41176 , 41303 , 41490 , 41942 , 42099 , 42564 , 43454 , 43785 , 44152 , 44453 , 45201 , 46180 , 47498 , 48046 , 48134 , 65825 , 66275
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C158587Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/26/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/26/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-16125
09/26/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/29/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction." fn3[We note that appellant's failure to pay the filing fee could constitute an independent basis on which to dimiss this appeal. Although appellant asserts that he was granted in forma pauperis status by the district court, the limited documents before us do not demonstrate this status. We need not investigate further as we are dismissing this appeal for lack of jurisdiction.] SNP04-RR/ML/WM 03-18071
11/25/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-18199
11/25/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 1, 2003. 03-18199