judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RODRIGUEZ-GUERRERO (JESUS) VS. STATE C/W 46047

Case Information: 46046
Short Caption:RODRIGUEZ-GUERRERO (JESUS) VS. STATE C/W 46047Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:46046*, 46047
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR011132Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/03/2005Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/03/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 05-19627
10/07/2005MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 46046/46047. 05-19902
10/11/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 05/20/05. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Dotson. 05-20042
10/25/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. The motion is granted and these appeals are hereby consolidated. Nos. 46046/46047. (05-21101) 05-21101
11/14/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Nos. 46046/46047. 05-22310
11/14/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Nos. 46046/46047. 05-22311
11/14/2005MotionFiled Motion. Request by Appellant to Require the District Court Clerk to Forward the Sealed Transcript of Sentencing Proceedings Occurring on Aprl 25, 2002 to This Court. Nos. 46046/46047. 05-22313
11/29/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Certified copy of the sentencing transcripts (sealed) due: 20 days. Nos. 46046/46047. (05-23408) 05-23408
12/01/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Nos. 46046/46047. 05-23565
12/13/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. SEALED transcript of proceedings of April 25, 2002 submitted by Washoe Co. Clerk. Nos. 46046/46047 05-24319
05/10/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. These are consolidated appeals. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP. Nos. 46046/46047. 06-09788
06/06/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-10249
06/06/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/22/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 7, 2006. 06-10249