judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LINTHICUM VS. RUDI

Case Information: 46040
Short Caption:LINTHICUM VS. RUDICourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0500657Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/11/2005 / Weise, CathySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:11/08/2006 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:The National Judicial College
Submission Date:11/08/2006How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/2005Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Gordon R. Muir, Ltd.--check no. 3509.
09/30/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 05-19495
10/07/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order filed 9/20/05. Due Date: 10 days
10/10/2005Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 05-19960
10/11/2005Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Cathy Valenta Weise. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/12/2005Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order/judgment of conviction filed in district court on September 20, 2005. 05-20241
10/14/2005Notice/Outgoing Letter. Cathy Valenta Weise. (district court order)
10/17/2005MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 05-20500
10/17/2005AppendixFiled Appendix. Record on Appeal; NRAP Rule 10 Appendix for Motion to Dismiss. 05-20502
10/24/2005MotionFiled Response to Motion. 05-21055
10/25/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. 05-21167
11/02/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 3, 2005. 05-21615
11/28/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-23241
12/19/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 05-24569
12/30/2005Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certification that no Transcript is to be requested. 05-25478
01/19/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Resolving Motion or Stipulation. Appellants' notice of appeal was timely, and we deny respondent's motion to dismiss. 06-01273
03/17/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-05818
03/17/2006AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 06-05819
04/18/2006BriefFiled Answering Brief. 06-08151
05/17/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. 06-10427
09/28/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on November 8, 2006, at 9:00 a.m. (NNP07-NB/JH/RP)
10/25/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
11/08/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP07-NB/JH/RP
12/28/2006Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Becker, Hardesty and Parraguirre, JJ. Author: Hardesty, J. We concur: Becker and Parraguirre, JJ. 122 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 120. NNP07B 06-26576
01/03/2007MotionFiled Motion. Verified Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements. 07-00199
01/11/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Gordon R. Muir, Ltd.--check no. 3999.
01/11/2007Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 07-00868
01/16/2007MotionFiled Motion. for Attorneys Fees. 07-01102
01/18/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Costs. Respondent filed a "Verified Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements." We direct the clerk to issue an itemized statement of costs in the amount of $91.92, which represents the allowable costs set forth in the memorandum of costs, for insertion in the remittitur. We disallow costs for certified docket for appeal, copy motion for appendix appeal, postage, and parking fees at the place of oral argument. We disallow these costs. fn4[Our disallowance is without prejudice to respondents' right to seek those costs that are taxable in the district court.] 07-01329
01/23/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Motion for Attorney's Fees. 07-01771
01/24/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to the Publishers from Cay Jordan, Editor. Correction on page 9 of the original opinion filed on December 28, 2006.
02/13/2007Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. And Denying Motion for Attorney Fees. "We deny rehearing." NRAP 40(c). Respondent has moved for attorney fees. We deny the motion. NNP07B-JH/RP 07-03501
03/13/2007RemittiturIssued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $91.92. 07-05654
03/13/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs distributed with Remittitur. 07-05452
03/13/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/21/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 16, 2007. 07-05452