judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DIMEGLIO (JOSEPH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42116
Short Caption:DIMEGLIO (JOSEPH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43496 , 45033
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C190966Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/01/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/01/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-16345
11/03/2003TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 17, 2003. Court Reporter: Lisa Makowski. 03-18312
01/21/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Appellant's counsel Lynn Avants shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 04-01172
02/12/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-02778
02/12/2004Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 04-02779
02/18/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed February 12, 2004. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix received on January 12, 2004. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. 04-03130
02/18/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-02779
02/18/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-02780
03/10/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-04557
04/26/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-07589
05/21/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-07685
05/21/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/16/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 24, 2004. 04-07685