judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TRONE HERBERT COOPER-EL V. BANK OF AMERICA

Case Information: 10-DA-0014
Short Caption:TRONE HERBERT COOPER-EL V. BANK OF AMERICAClassification:Discretionary - Discretionary - Small Claims
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SC3-1840-10Filed Date:08/18/2010

Opening Event Date:08/18/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerTrone Herbert Cooper-El NPro SeN
RespondentBank of AmericaNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/18/2010APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE OF APPEAL Denied
08/18/2010FILING FEE of $10.00.
08/19/2010TMC - application for allowance of appeal
09/08/2010 ORDERED that the AAA IS HEREBY DENIED. See Karath v. Generalis, 277 A.2d 650, 651 (DC 1971) (small claims decision reviewable only when applicant states grounds showing apparent error or a question of law which has not been, but should be, decided by this court). (FITHNW) (kt)
09/23/2010PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for reconsideration.
09/24/2010TMC - motion for reconsideration
10/06/2010 ORDERED that the MOTION IS DENIED. See DC App. R. 6(f) (motion for reconsideration may be fled w/n 7 days of denial of the application). (FITHNW) (kt)