judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARTENEY VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34807
Short Caption:MARTENEY VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 23831Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Wilson & Barrows-check no. 1016.
09/10/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 99-08533
11/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. 99-10696
11/23/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Party in Interest Shawna Sue Wood's Brief in Opposition to Writ of Prohibition. 99-11707
03/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. "Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus." We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-03293
03/02/2000WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Stewart R. Wilson for service upon Judge Jack B. Ames. 00-03318
03/08/2000WritFiled Writ. Served on Hon. Jack B. Ames on March 6, 2000. 00-03318
03/28/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-04910
03/28/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/05/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order vacating order changing venue filed in district court on April 3, 2000 (no action required per A.H.). 00-05514