judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MEDFORD (KEVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42122
Short Caption:MEDFORD (KEVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR031123Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/02/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/02/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 03-16437
10/09/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: July 30, 2003, August 29, 2003. Court Reporter: D. Davidson. Filed in district court on: 10/07/03. 03-16802
10/15/2003Other Returned Mail. Receipt for documents addressed to Kevin Medford remailed to corrected address.
10/15/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 30, 2003 and August 30, 2003. Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. 03-17172
11/13/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 19, 2003. 03-18892
11/20/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-19397
12/04/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed November 20, 2003. Appellant's counsel shall file the fast track statement and appendix on or before December 19, 2003. 03-20142
12/22/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-21312
12/22/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. 03-21313
01/13/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-00776
03/05/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP04S-MS/NB/MG 04-04171
03/30/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-04308
03/30/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/09/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 1, 2004. 04-04308