judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCELROY (JENNIFER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42068
Short Caption:MCELROY (JENNIFER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR031392Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-15702
09/29/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: Dates not specified. Court Reporter: Not named. Filed in district court on: 09/26/03. 03-16208
10/22/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-17595
10/22/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/17/03; 7/18/03; 8/14/03. Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. 03-17597
11/03/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. On October 22, 2003, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of 30 days to file the fast track statement in this appeal. The motion is granted in part. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file the fast track statement and appendix. 03-18214
11/14/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-18998
11/14/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 03-18999
11/19/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 03-19265
02/10/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn5[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-02568
03/09/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-02628
03/09/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/29/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 15, 2004. 04-02628