judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ADAMS (MELVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42089
Short Caption:ADAMS (MELVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44046
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C149621Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/15/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15933
10/22/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (each complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] Nos. 42087/42089/42139/42179/42182 - cases are not consolidated. 03-17543
11/03/2003Other Returned Mail. Order filed 10/22/03 addressed to Melvin Adams returned. No forwarding address.
01/15/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 04-00914
01/15/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/11/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that Adams is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarrnted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP04D-RR/WM/MD 04-10805
07/06/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-11426
07/06/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/04/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 9, 2004. 04-11426