judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALFORD (MAJIED) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44004
Short Caption:ALFORD (MAJIED) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39753 , 40128 , 41634 , 41808 , 42330 , 43648 , 43649
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C172809Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/05/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/27/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-17844
10/12/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 04-18930
10/22/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 04-19538
10/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] Nos. 43939/ 43976/ 44001/ 44004/ 44006 - cases are not consolidated. 04-19597
11/05/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 04-20422
11/05/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/30/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. The record before this court does not contain a transcript of the district court hearing held on September 10, 2004. If the transcript has been prepared and filed with the district court, the clerk of the district court shall transmit certified a copy to the clerk of this court within 10 days from the date of this order as a supplemental record on appeal. If the transcript has not been prepared and filed below, the district court shall order its prompt preparation. If such an order is required, the clerk of the district court shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to transmit a copy of the district court's order to the clerk of this court. The clerk of the district court shall then have 10 days from the date the transcript is filed within which to transmit certified copy to the clerk of this court as a supplemental record on appeal. 04-21779
12/15/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: September 10, 2004. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 04-22866
12/20/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 9/10/04. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 04-23194
01/07/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that Alford is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-00370
02/16/2005Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[We have received Alford's supplemental record filed in proper person, and conclude that no relief based upoon that submission is warranted.] NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-03160
03/15/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-03289
03/15/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/23/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 17, 2005. 05-03289
03/25/2005Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC 05-05862