judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BROWNE (JASON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44008
Short Caption:BROWNE (JASON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33769 , 46981 , 47992 , 69656 , 69656-COA , 78410 , 78410-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C116691Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/01/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/27/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-17852
09/29/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18069
10/13/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/21/04, 06/24/04, and 08/20/04. To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. 04-18963
10/13/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-18964
11/15/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 21, 2004; June 24, 2004; and August 20, 2004. Court Reporter: Janie Olen. 04-20883
02/08/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix.
02/28/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-03868
03/11/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed February 28, 2005. Appellant shall have until April 15, 2005, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. We note that the court disapproves of lengthy requests for extensions of time to brief appeals in criminal cases. Consequently, no further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Counsel's caseload will not be deemed such a circumstance. 05-04877
05/02/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 05-08609
05/02/2005BriefReceived Opening Brief. 05-08611
05/02/2005AppendixReceived Appendix to Opening Brief. 05-08612
05/09/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed May 2, 2005. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on May 2, 2005. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. 05-08984
05/09/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-08611
05/09/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 05-08612
06/14/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-11659
06/14/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 05-11660
07/18/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief. 05-14264
09/01/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 05-17337
09/01/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/18/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06R-MD/RR/RP 05-20647
11/15/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-20715
11/15/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/28/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 22, 2005. 05-20715