judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MIKOHN GAMING VS. ESPINOSA

Case Information: 44014
Short Caption:MIKOHN GAMING VS. ESPINOSACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0301329AClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/05/2004 / Manoukian, NoelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/09/2006How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from J. Michael McGroarty, Chtd.--check no. 21329.
09/29/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-18019
09/29/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Contained in original notice of appeal packet. 04-18255
10/04/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 on cross-appeal from Piscevich & Fenner--check no. 17150.
10/04/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 04-18359
10/04/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Amended notice of cross-appeal contained in cross-appeal packet.) 04-18361
10/04/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Second amended notice of cross-appeal contained in cross-appeal packet.) 04-18362
10/05/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Noel E. Manoukian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/08/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-18741
10/13/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Served Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 04-18997
10/15/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-19120
10/20/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 04-19362
02/15/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Law firm of Piscevich & Fenner. 05-03025
02/16/2005Notice/Outgoing Letter. Noel E. Manoukian. (Notice of Change of Address)
03/04/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 6, 2005. 05-04309
04/27/2005Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 05-08335
07/13/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant/cross-respondent, Mikohn Gaming ('appellant') and respondent/cross-appellant, Distinctive Interior D'Signs, ('cross-appellant') shall each have 10 days from the date of this order to request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a). Appellant shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Within 30 days of service of that brief, respondent Cipriano Espinosa ('respondent') shall file and serve an answering brief on appeal and cross-appellant shall file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days from service of respondent's answering brief and cross-appellant's combined brief to file and serve a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Cross-appellant shall have 30 days from service of appellant's combined brief to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal, if deemed necessary. 05-13903
08/10/2005Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Mikohn Gaming. 05-15788
08/15/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days (Respondent/Cross-Appellant Distinctive Interior D'Signs.)
08/15/2005Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Mikohn Gaming. 05-16174
08/18/2005Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 05-16453
10/05/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix.
10/07/2005MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule. Extending time to file opening brief until October 12, 2005. 05-19892
10/12/2005Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. extending the time to file the opening brief. 05-20153
10/17/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-20537
10/17/2005AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 4. 05-20538
11/10/2005MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. (Respondent Espinosa's Answering Brief.) Brief due: December 12, 2005. 05-22212
11/15/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Distinctive Interior D'Signs. 05-22411
12/12/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. Cipriano Espinosa's Answering Brief. 05-24259
01/09/2006MotionFiled Stipulation. 06-00578
01/11/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. Combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal from appellant due: 5 days. 06-00718
01/13/2006BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent Mikohn Gaming. 06-01031
02/21/2006Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No cross appeal-reply brief filed.
03/09/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 06-05154
03/09/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/13/2006Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Douglas, Becker and Parraguirre, JJ. Author: Per Curiam. Douglas, Becker and Parraguirre, JJ. 122 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 54. NNP06 06-14511
08/08/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-16267
08/08/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/17/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 9, 2006. 06-16267