judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HINZ VS. HINZ

Case Information: 42092
Short Caption:HINZ VS. HINZCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D174117Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/09/2003 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/15/2004How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Bruce I. Shapiro, Ltd.--check no. 2972.
09/24/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15975
10/09/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/09/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16803
10/10/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. M. Nelson Segel. (docketing statement)
12/11/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 03-20677
12/23/2003Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Because this is a child custody matter, appellant shall 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days from service of the opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have 10 days from service of the answering brief to file and serve the reply brief if deemed necessary. 03-21351
01/26/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/19/03, 03/24/03, 04/21/03, 05/12/03, 06/11/03, 07/10/03, and 07/11/03. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. 04-01554
02/23/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 02/19/03, 03/24/03, 04/21/03, 05/12/03, 06/11/03 (2), 07/10/03 (2), and 07/11/03. Court Reporter: Kristin Hicks. 04-03478
03/25/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-05587
03/25/2004AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. 04-05588
04/15/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-06930
04/26/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. 04-07649
04/30/2004MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion to have Original Exhibit and Video Tape transmitted to Supreme Court for Review. 04-07976
05/14/2004MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Respondent's Motion to have Original Exhibit and Video Tape transmitted to Supreme Court for Review. 04-09051
06/09/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of Exhibit. Respondent has moved to have the original Family Mediation Center Child Interview Report ('Child Interview Report') and the videotape of an interview between the district court judge and the two minor children transmitted to this court. Appellant opposes transmission of both items. We grant respondent's motion in part. The clerk of the district court shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, certify and transmit to this court a copy of the Child Interview Report, identified as "FMC REPORT," and admitted on July 10, 2003, in district court case number D174117. The Child Interview Report shall remain confidential, and the district court clerk shall transmit it to this court under seal. 04-10647
06/18/2004ExhibitFiled Exhibits (copies). Exhibits: A - FMC Report on July 10, 2003 (SEALED). 04-11166
09/15/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. See NRAP 34(f)(1). 04-16983
09/15/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP04D-RR/WM/MD
12/01/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP04D-RR/WM/MD 04-21896
12/28/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits: A-FMC Report on July 10, 2003 (sealed) this day. 04-22302
12/28/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/28/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 30, 2004. 04-22302