judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARDSON (LORNE) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 44009
Short Caption:RICHARDSON (LORNE) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PI04438Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/27/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/28/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/28/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-17968
10/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] 04-19559
10/27/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 04-19885
10/27/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/17/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. It appears that the district court may have erroneously denied appellant's petition. This court directs the State to show cause within 30 days form the date of this order why this matter should not be remanded for further proceedings upon the petition. 04-21085
12/17/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 04-23089
12/29/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 17, 2004. This court grants the State's motion to file a response on or before February 15, 2005. 04-23615
02/15/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. To file response (second request). 05-03091
02/24/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. This court grants the motion filed on February 15, 2005 and directs that the State shall have to and including March 17, 2005, to file a response. 05-03718
03/17/2005MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 05-05304
04/22/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn4[This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-07886
05/19/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-08055
05/19/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 20, 2005. 05-08055