judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EVANS VS. STATE, GAMING CONTROL BOARD

Case Information: 44003
Short Caption:EVANS VS. STATE, GAMING CONTROL BOARDCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44518
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A482943Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:RoseCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Douglas for Justice RosePanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2004OtherDisqualification of Justice Rose.
09/27/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/27/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-17841
10/26/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "As appellant's notice of appeal is premature, we lack jurisdiction and therefore " . . . dismiss this appeal." fn3[We note that appellant may appeal when the district court enters its formal, final judgment. See NRAP 4(a)(1). Additionally, we note that appellant's failure to pay the supreme court filing fee could constitute an independent basis on which to dismiss this appeal.] SNP04S-MS/WM/MD 04-19743
11/23/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-19909
11/23/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/24/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Return of Letter. This proper person appeal was dismissed for lack of jurisdiction on October 26, 2004. On November 1, 2004, this court received appellant's proper person letter regarding his in forma pauperis application in the district court. As this appeal has been dismissed, we direct the clerk of this court to return the letter to appellant, without filing it. 04-21635
11/24/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Jamar Evans. Returned unfiled, the original "Proper Person Letter received on November 1, 2004."
12/06/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 29, 2004. 04-19909
12/08/2004Other Returned Unfiled Document. Numerous proper person documents.