judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MOXLEY (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44002
Short Caption:MOXLEY (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41050 , 43830 , 45905 , 46112 , 46774 , 48500 , 48542 , 48543 , 48973 , 49077 , 61157
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C189183Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/24/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/27/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-17834
10/14/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/14/03, 01/21/03, 02/04/03, 02/13/03, 03/18/03, 03/20/03, 08/05/03, 11/25/03, 12/09/03, 12/23/03, 01/06/04, 02/10/04, 02/17/04, 03/02/04, 03/09/04, 03/16/04, 03/18/04, 04/27/04, 05/04/04, 05/06/04, 05/13/04, 05/18/04, 05/25/04, 05/27/04, 06/22/04, 06/24/04, 06/29/04, 06/30/04, 07/01/04, 07/22/04, and 08/19/04. To Court Reporter: Shirleey Prawalsky and Dick Kangas. 04-19050
10/14/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-19051
12/22/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 01/14/03, 01/21/03, 02/04/03, 02/13/03, 03/18/03, 03/20/03, 08/05/03, 11/25/03, 12/09/03, 12/23/03, 01/06/04, 02/10/04, 02/17/04, 03/02/04, 03/09/04, 03/16/04, 03/18/04, 04/27/04, 05/04/04, 05/06/04, 05/13/04, 05/18/04, 05/25/04, 05/27/04, 06/22/04, 06/24/04, 06/29/04, 06/30/04, 07/01/04, 07/22/04, and 08/19/04. Court Reporter: Richard Kangas. 04-23324
01/24/2005MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 22, 2005. 05-01506
02/24/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-03680
02/24/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 05-03681
03/25/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-05880
05/03/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 8, 2005, appellant submitted a proper person motion. Because appellant is represented by counsel, we decline to grant him leave to file documents in proper person. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the proper person document received on April 8, 2005. Appellant shall address all concerns regarding this appeal to counsel, and shall proceed through counsel in the prosecution of this appeal. 05-08628
05/03/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant John Tole Moxley. Returned unfiled, the proper person "Motion of Appellant's Objection to Error'd, Ineffective, Deficient Opening Brief Filed by Public Defenders Office received on April 8, 2005."
05/11/2005Case Status Update Briefing in Progress. No reply brief filed.
05/24/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 05-10236
05/24/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/29/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has submitted a proper person motion requesting dismissal of his present counsel and for the appointment of new counsel, or alternatively for permission to represent himself on appeal. Appellant's proper person motion is hereby denied. Appellant shall proceed hereafter by and through his appointed counsel. 05-12889
06/29/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-12928
07/25/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Resolving Proper Person Submissions. On June 29, 2005, this court entered an order of affirmance in this appeal. On that same date, this court entered an order denying appellant's proper person motion to dismiss his current counsel and for the appointment of new counsel, or for permission to represent himself. On July 13, 2005, appellant submitted an amended motion with the same requests. fn1[The clerk shall file the proper person motion received on July 13, 2005.] Cause appearing, we deny appellant's proper person amended motion. On July 15, 2005, appellant submitted a proper person petition for rehearing. As appellant has not been granted leave to file papers in proper person, the clerk shall return, unfiled, the proper person petition for rehearing. If counsel deems it appropriate, he may file a petition for rehearing within 15 days from the date of this order. Appellant shall proceed through counsel in the prosecution of this appeal. The clerk shall return, unfiled, any future proper person documents received in this appeal from appellant. 05-14662
08/04/2005Other Returned Unfiled Document. Original and one copy of the document entitled, "Motion Objecting to the Deprivation of the Right (Effective Assistance of Counsel) on Appeal" pursuant to 7/25/05 order.
08/19/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-16481
08/19/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/26/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 22, 2005. 05-16481