judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-7828
B-7828
08/11/1978
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
SHERMAN MCBEATH, ADMINISTRATOR, TEXAS ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE COMMISSION
HON. CHARLES D. MATTHEWS, IRBY FOX, RON STRADER, ET AL., JAMES P. DUNIGAN AND M. L. RICHARDS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/19/1978Errata FiledRespondent
09/19/1978Exhibits in case/cause filed
09/18/1978Brief on the MeritsRespondent
09/15/1978Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
09/13/1978Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
09/13/1978Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
09/13/1978Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
09/13/1978Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
08/28/1978Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
08/14/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
08/14/1978Supplement to ResponseRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/11/1978Opinion issued
09/22/1978Order from Lower Court filed
09/19/1978Errata Filed
09/19/1978Exhibits in case/cause filed
09/18/1978Affidavit filed
09/18/1978Affidavit filed
09/18/1978Brief on the Merits
09/15/1978Brief in Support of Petition
09/13/1978Order from Lower Court filed
09/13/1978Brief in Support of Petition
09/13/1978Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
09/13/1978Exhibits in case/cause filed
09/13/1978Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
08/28/1978Supplemental Brief filed
08/28/1978Response to Motion filed
08/14/1978Response to Petition
08/14/1978Supplement to Response
08/14/1978Response to Motion filed
08/11/1978Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sherman McBeath, Administrator, Texas Alcoholic Beverage CommissionRelator
Irby FoxRespondent
Ron Strader, et al.Respondent
James P. Dunigan and M. L. RichardsRespondent
Hon. Charles D. MatthewsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information