judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-7839
B-7839
08/17/1978
Application for Writ of Error
BERNARD DODD
TEXAS FARM PRODUCTS COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/15/1979Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/01/1978Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
11/27/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
08/17/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/15/1979Letter Filed
02/23/1979Response to Motion filed
02/15/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/31/1979Opinion issued
12/01/1978Supplemental Brief filed
11/27/1978Response to Petition
11/01/1978Document received (See Remarks)
08/17/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/17/1978Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Farm Products CompanyRespondent
Bernard DoddPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information