judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STOCKMEIER VS. PSYCHOLOGICAL REVIEW PANEL

Case Information: 42063
Short Caption:STOCKMEIER VS. PSYCHOLOGICAL REVIEW PANELCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48677
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PI03405Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/19/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15692
09/24/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. PI03405: 120 days. fn2[See NRAP 11(a)(2) (providing that the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.)] The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 03-16010
10/01/2003Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 03-16327
10/01/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/17/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to file Briefs in Proper Person and Denying Motion to Supplement Record on Appeal. Appellant has submitted a motion for leave to file documents in proper person under NRAP 46(b), along with a proposed opening brief. We grant appellant's motion for the limited purpose of filing briefs and direct the clerk of this court to file the opening brief received on October 24, 2003. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an answering brief. Appellant may file a reply brief, if any, within 20 days from service of the answering brief. Appellant also submitted a motion to supplement the record on appeal and a proposed supplement consisting of two documents, an order and a "conditional" notice of appeal. We note that the order is included in the record on appeal filed by the district court clerk, and the "conditional" notice of appeal submitted by appellant does not bear a district court file stamp. It thus appears that no supplement to the record is necessary or proper, and we deny the motion. 03-19058
11/17/2003BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. 03-17799
12/17/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-20989
12/22/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed December 17, 2003. Respondent shall have until January 16, 2004, to file and serve the answering brief. 03-21189
01/16/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-01024
01/26/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant's Proper Person Reply Brief. 04-01528
06/07/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for Leave to file Supplemental Authorities and to Expedite. Briefing was completed in this proper person appeal on January 26, 2004. On May 24, 2004, appellant submitted supplemental authorities in support of his opening and reply briefs. On June 1, 2004, appellant submitted a motion for leave to file the supplemental authorities under NRAP 31(d). We grant the motion and direct the clerk to file the supplemental authorities received on May 24, 2004. Appellant has also submitted a motion to expedite our decision of this appeal, stating that he is scheduled to appear before the Psychological Review Panel in December 2005, and that this court's decision may impact the Panel's proceedings. We grant the motion. Our consideration of this appeal shall be expedited to the extent that our docket permits. 05-11168
06/07/2005BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. Supplemental Authorities in Support of Briefs. 04-09553
10/19/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 05-20651
10/19/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP06R-MD/RR/RP
12/29/2005Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Douglas, Rose and Parraguirre, JJ. Author: Per Curiam. 121 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 88. NNP06R 02/16/06 Order: opinion withdrawn.jcr 05-25332
01/05/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. (rehearing fee)
01/05/2006Post-Judgment PetitionReceived Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Rehearing and Motion for Clarification. 01/23/06 order: filed rehearing.jcr 06-00267
01/23/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for leave to file a proper person petition for rehearing. The clerk shall file the proper person petition for rehearing received on January 5, 2006. 06-01599
01/23/2006Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Rehearing and Motion for Clarification. 06-00267
02/16/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Withdrawing Opinion and Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. This court previously issued an opinion in this appeal. Stockmeier v. Psychological Review Panel, 121 Nev. ___, ___ P.3d ___ (Adv. Op. No. 88, December 29, 2005). Appellant has petitioned this court for rehearing. Respondent shall have 15 days to file and serve an answer to the petition. We withdraw our opinion in this matter from publication pending resolution of the petition for rehearing. 06-03483
03/29/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, respondents have not filed an answer to the petition. Accordingly, appellant's petition for rehearing shall stand submitted for decision on the petition and record before this court 7 days from the date of this order. 06-06567
06/01/2006Opinion/DispositionalFiled Opinion on Rehearing. "Petition for rehearing granted. Affirmed in part, reversed in part and remanded with instructions." Before Rose, C.J., Douglas and Parraguirre, JJ. Author: Rose, C.J. We concur: Douglas and Parraguirre, JJ. 122 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 50. NNP06R 06-11471
06/28/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. fn1[We direct the clerk to file the proper person motions received on June 9, 2006.] The clerk shall file the petition for en banc reconsideration received on June 9, 2006. The clerk shall detach from appellant's motion for leave to file an appendix the document designated as "Appendix 1" and file it separately herein. 06-13365
06/28/2006MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to file Pro Se Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.clerk1 06/28/06 order-fn1: filed motion.jcr 06-12124
06/28/2006MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to file Appendix in Proper Person/Appendix in Support of Petition for En Banc Reconsideration or, in the Alternate, Request for Court to take Judicial Notice. 06-12127
06/28/2006Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. 06-12126
06/28/2006AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. 06-13373
06/28/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-11983
06/28/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 29, 2006. 06-11983
07/06/2006Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC 06-13979