judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITE VS. REYNOLDS

Case Information: 42064
Short Caption:WHITE VS. REYNOLDSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A451501Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/2003 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Callister & Reynolds--check no. 2413.
09/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15695
09/30/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/22/2003MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 03-17600
11/03/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Entry of Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of the Appeal. 03-18313
11/13/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 03-18943
11/13/2003Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.