judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BURRIOLA (ANTHONY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44015
Short Caption:BURRIOLA (ANTHONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34844 , 41298 , 55364 , 62155 , 62583 , 69568
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C143171Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/02/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/29/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 04-18065
10/11/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the record on appeal due: 60 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (the complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings). fn2[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] 04-18817
10/20/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order/judgment of conviction filed in district court on October 7, 2004. 04-19416
12/02/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 8. 04-22003
12/02/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/07/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. The State shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be remanded to the district court to consider those claims raised in Burriola's July 8, 2004, habeas petition that were being raised again because they were not previously considered by the district court in the first proceeding. 05-00380
02/08/2005MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 05-02511
05/02/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record. A transcript of the hearing held on June 30, 2003 is necessary for this court's review of this appeal. If a transcript has been prepared and filed with the district court, the clerk of the district court shall transmit a certified copy to the clerk of this court within 10 days from the date of this order as a supplemental record on appeal. If a transcript has not been prepared and filed below, the district court shall order its prompt preparation. The clerk of the district court shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to transmit a copy of the district court's order to the clerk of this court. The clerk of the district court shall then have 10 days from the date the transcript is filed within which to transmit a certified copy to the clerk of this court as a supplemental record on appeal. 05-08533
05/13/2005TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 6/30/03. Court Reporter: Sonia L. Riley. 05-09409
05/17/2005TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 6/30/03. Court Reporter: Sonia I. Riley. 05-09553
09/13/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-18042
09/20/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. In light of the order filed on September 13, 2005, the proper person motions received in this court January 25, 2005, and February 14, 2005, are denied as moot. 05-18628
12/07/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Return of Proper Person Document. The clerk shall return to appellant the proper person petition for en banc reconsideration received on November 23, 2005. Appellant may resubmit such a petition within 10 days after this court's entry of any order denying his petition for rehearing. 05-23934
12/07/2005Other Returned Unfiled Document. NRAP 40-A-Appeal, Petition for En Banc Reconsideration received November 23, 2005 to appellant Anthony Burriola.
12/09/2005Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[On December 6, 2005, this court received appellant's proper person request for permission to file supplemental points and authorities. We deny this request.] SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-24111
01/03/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-00039
01/03/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/19/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 5, 2006. 06-00039
02/02/2006Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[On December 16, 2005, this court received Burriola's proper person motion for clarification. We deny the motion.] EN BANC 06-02402