judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BICKOM (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 44016
Short Caption:BICKOM (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44182 , 48564 , 51635 , 55077
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C167925Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/15/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/2004Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/29/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 04-18067
09/29/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/05/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/13/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This appeal is subject to the provisions of Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure 3C. Appellant was represented in the district court by Craig Mueller. After sentencing, the district court granted Mueller's motion to withdraw and subsequently appointed Karen A. Connolly as appellate counsel. The district court's order does not, however, relieve Mueller of his duty to comply with the requirements of NRAP 3C. Mueller must first file a fast track statement. Accordingly, Mueller shall file a fast track statement within 40 days of this order. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. fn1[Connolly shall continue as appellate counsl, and may file a supplemental fast track statement if necessary, as provided by NRAP 3C(g).] 04-18968
10/14/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on October 6, 2004. 04-19029
11/15/2004TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 6/23/04, 6/24/04, 7/12/04, 8/30/04. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 04-20859
11/24/2004Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: December 1, 2004. 04-21542
11/24/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 04-21581
11/24/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 04-21582
12/15/2004Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 04-22841
01/06/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Fast Track Statement. 05-00337
01/12/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed January 6, 2005. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the supplemental fast track statement. 05-00620
02/04/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 05-02318
02/04/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Appellant's Supplemental Fast Track Appendix 05-02319
02/25/2005MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Respondent's Supplemental Fast Track Response. 05-03785
02/25/2005MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 11 Page Supplemental Fast Track Response. 05-03786
03/04/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed February 25, 2005. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the 11-page supplemental fast track response provisionally submitted on February 25, 2005. 05-04289
03/04/2005Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 05-03788
03/16/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. This court has concluded that full briefing of this appeal is warranted. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party must file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. fn2[In the absence of an objection to the sufficiency of the rough draft transcripts, counsel need not file a certified transcript in this appeal as ordinarily required by NRAP 9. But should either counsel object to the sufficiency of the rough draft transcript or cite to transcripts not previously prepared, counsel shall file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts pursuant to NRAP 9(a).] Thereafter, briefing shall proceed as set forth in NRAP 31. 05-05153
04/08/2005MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 16, 2005. 05-06983
05/17/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-09581
06/23/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-12369
07/27/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief. 05-14876
07/27/2005AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. 05-14877
08/15/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 05-16062
08/15/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/11/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-00753
02/07/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-01377
02/07/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/02/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 9, 2006. 06-01377