judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MERRITT (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42086
Short Caption:MERRITT (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C174637Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Pretrial
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 03-15929
10/15/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP04S-NB/MS/MG 03-17096
11/12/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-17563
11/12/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 14, 2003. 03-17563