judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

UNITED GAS CORPORATION v. SHEPHERD LAUNDRIES COMPANY, INC.

Case: A-331
A-331
09/05/1944
Application for Writ of Error
UNITED GAS CORPORATION
SHEPHERD LAUNDRIES COMPANY, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/01/1945Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
08/01/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/25/1945Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
04/23/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
03/08/1945Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/08/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/08/1945Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
11/27/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
11/16/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/09/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/14/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
09/05/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/06/1945Response to Motion filed
08/01/1945Brief in Support of Petition
08/01/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/25/1945Brief on the Merits
04/23/1945Brief on the Merits
03/28/1945Document received (See Remarks)
03/28/1945Document received (See Remarks)
03/28/1945Document received (See Remarks)
03/28/1945Document received (See Remarks)
03/08/1945Brief in Support of Petition
03/08/1945Motion for RehearingFiling granted
01/08/1945Supplemental Brief filed
11/27/1944Brief in Support of Petition
11/16/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/09/1944Reply to Response
09/14/1944Response to Petition
09/05/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
09/05/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Shepherd Laundries Company, Inc.Respondent
United Gas CorporationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information