judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALTERGOTT (ALLAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34802
Short Caption:ALTERGOTT (ALLAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38474 , 43725
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C152667Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/10/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/10/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-08525
09/20/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 02/16/99 - 02/18/99 and 08/06/99 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Yvonne Valentin. 99-08881
09/20/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-08882
12/17/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 1, 2000. 99-12831
12/27/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 02/16/99; 02/17/99; 02/18/99; 08/06/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Yvonne N. Valentin. 99-13168
01/18/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No Postmark. 00-00775
01/18/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-00779
02/15/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express- No postmark. 00-02352
08/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Pursuant to NRAP 34(f)(1), we have concluded that oral argument is not warranted.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14010
09/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14124
09/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14124