judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JORGE A. SANCHEZ V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1007
Short Caption:JORGE A. SANCHEZ V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD5664-10Filed Date:08/12/2010

Opening Event Date:08/12/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/29/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/18/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJorge A. Sanchez YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/12/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/27/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Miguel Serrano, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
08/27/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Miguel Serrano, Esquire
09/13/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
09/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (51pgs/Tape) 7/15/10 proc. w/CD included
09/29/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/01/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/06/2010RECORD INDEX
10/06/2010RECORD COPIES
11/19/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF and appendix no oppo
11/19/2010RECEIVED - aplt's brief & appendix
12/07/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
12/07/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/07/2010APPENDIX
01/06/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
01/07/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief and appendix
03/25/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. Oliver T. Carr Mgm't Inc. v. Nat'l Deli Inc. 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)... SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
03/25/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that judgment is HEREBY AFFIRMED. (RDKRTE) (jl)
04/18/2011MANDATE ISSUED
04/26/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER