judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION v. JAMES HANSTINE

Case Heading (S-07-0149)
Case Number:S-07-0149Case Docketed On:07/09/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION v. JAMES HANSTINE
Full Title:STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellant (Petitioner), v. JAMES HANSTINE, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionJames Clarence Demers
Steven R. Czoschke
AppelleeJames HanstineMargaret M. White

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/09/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/09/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/09/2007Event - Phone Call. Spoke with Mr. Demers, he will be filing the brief in this case, but to notify the A.G.'s office that the case has been docketed.EventPhone CallFinal
08/08/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/10/2007Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
09/13/2007Response/Objection - Motion to dismiss appealResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/20/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/20/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/25/2007Order - Denying motion to dismiss appeal and order denying motion to hold appeal in abeyanceOrderDenyFinal
10/30/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/30/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/16/2007Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
11/19/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
11/19/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal