judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALEXANDER (JACK) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 42085
Short Caption:ALEXANDER (JACK) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CVHC02789Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-15926
09/23/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: August 7, 2003. Court Reporter: Dept. 1. Filed in district court on: September 18, 2003. 03-15927
10/03/2003TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: August 7, 2003. Court Reporter: Jeanne Null. 03-16461
10/03/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-16496
10/03/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 03-16497
10/10/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Filed Second Copy. 03-16497
10/21/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 03-17510
01/21/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP04S-MS/RR/WM 04-01161
02/18/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-01418
02/18/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/27/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 20, 2004. 04-01418