judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUNCAN (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42098
Short Caption:DUNCAN (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44435 , 67482 , 67482-COA , 75978
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C190441Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/25/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/25/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-16036
09/25/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 3/12/03, 4/30/03, 5/29/03, 6/3/03, 6/12/03, 6/16/03 through 6/19/03 and 8/11/03. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. Filed in district court on: September 19, 2003. 03-16037
09/25/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 12, 2003, April 30, 2003, May 29, 2003, June 3, 2003, June 12, 2003, June 16, 2003 through June 19, 2003 and August 11, 2003. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. 03-16038
11/05/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 12, 2003. 03-18416
12/02/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-20016
12/02/2003MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. 03-20017
12/04/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 2, 2003. The clerk of this court shall file the 29-page fast track statement and appendix received on December 2, 2003. Respondent shall have 20 days from the dte of this order to file and serve the fast track response. 03-20189
12/04/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-20018
12/04/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 03-20019
12/05/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 03-20294
02/12/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Affirmance and Limited Remand to Correct the Judgment of Conviction. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED and REMAND this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of correcting the judgment of conviction." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-02747
03/09/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-02919
03/09/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/29/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 11, 2004. 04-02919