judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PEARL (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42097
Short Caption:PEARL (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36565
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C162563Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/25/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/25/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 03-16035
10/30/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-18152
11/05/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 30, 2003. Appellant's counsel shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. No further extensions shall be granted absent extreme and unforeseen circumstances. 03-18497
12/08/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-20407
12/30/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 8, 2003. Counsel for appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 03-21618
03/04/2004MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 04-04123
03/23/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On March 4, 2004, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw this appeal voluntarily. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[Because no remittitur will issue in this matter, see NRAP 42(b), the one-year period for filing a post-conviction habeas corpus petition under NRS 34.726(1) shall commence to run from the date of this order.] SNP04S-MS/RR/WM 04-05445
03/23/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.