judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SWAFFORD VS. TOP RANK, INC.

Case Information: 42095
Short Caption:SWAFFORD VS. TOP RANK, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A440654Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/08/2003 / Tanksley, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/24/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-16018
09/24/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/24/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/07/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy filed in district court on October 3, 2003. 03-16669
10/07/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Douglas H. Clark. 03-16670
10/07/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Douglas H. Clark - check no. 9681.
10/08/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/09/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Thomas J. Tanksley. (case appeal statement)
10/14/2003MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 03-17041
10/14/2003Other Other. Filed Exhibits to Motion to Dismiss. 03-17042
11/06/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondents have filed a motion requesting this court to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. We deny the motion. This denial is without prejudice to respondents' right to renew the motion, if necessary, upon completion of settlement proceedings. 03-18516
12/12/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. 03-20739
01/30/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. 04-01985
03/30/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: to be announced. 04-05899
05/27/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: to be determined. 04-09814
06/18/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 04-11163
06/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. 04-11369
06/29/2004Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 04-11879
09/29/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. On January 29, 2004, this court entered an order that directed appellant to request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a). To date, appellant has failed to file the appropriate document. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a). Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal. 04-18055
10/12/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-18832
10/12/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/24/03, 04/07/03, 04/15/03, 04/28/03, 06/02/03, 06/16/03, 07/03/03, 08/04/03, 08/16/03, 11/17/03, 11/24/03, and 12/02/03. To Court Reporter: Free Lance Court Reporters. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. 04-18833
10/21/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Request for Transcripts. 04-19445
12/07/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Opening Brief and Transcripts. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] Free Lance Court Reporters shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the requested transcripts. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcripts, Free Lance Court Reporters shall, within the same time period, file a motion requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcripts cannot be produced, Free Lance Court Reporters shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 04-22257
12/13/2004Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Leta Haupt. The transcripts have been prepared, but no payment has been received. 04-22688
12/21/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Transcripts. On December 13, 2004, Free Lance Court Reporters responded to our December 7, 2004, order. Leta Haupt, the owner of Free Lance Court Reporters, informs this court that the requested transcripts have been prepared since October 15, 2004, but have not been filed because Free Lance Court Reporters has not received 'payment' from appellant. fn1[We note that the notice of nonpayment was not timely filed. Additionally, we note that the notice does not include a statement of the full amount of the deposit and the amount that remains unpaid, as required by NRAP 9(b)(2).] Counsel for appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to pay the required deposit to Free Lance Court Reporters, if he has not done so already, and to provide this court with written proof of such payment. 04-23214
12/21/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule and the filing of transcripts in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondents may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. 04-23285
03/14/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. ". . . we dismiss it." SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-04955
04/08/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-05250
04/08/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/18/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 12, 2005. 05-05250