judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MILLER VS. DIST. CT. (ACRES GAMING)

Case Information: 42096
Short Caption:MILLER VS. DIST. CT. (ACRES GAMING)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 51350
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A470016Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt.
09/24/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/24/2003Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, Prohibition, with Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. (Filed via fax.) 03-15998
09/24/2003MotionFiled Motion. Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief and Motion for Expedited Review of Writ Petition. (Filed via fax.) 03-16001
09/24/2003AppendixFiled Appendix. Volumes 1 through 3. 03-16006
09/24/2003Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Lionel Sawyer & Collins. They will be filing an opposition to the petition filed today. 03-16034
09/25/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Beckley Singleton - check no. 099255.
09/25/2003Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. ORIGNAL Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, Prohibition, with Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed via fax on 9/24/03. 03-15998
09/25/2003MotionFiled Motion. ORIGINAL Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief and Motion for Expedited Review of Writ Petition filed via fax on 9/24/03. 03-16001
09/25/2003MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to "Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief and Motion for Expedited Review of Writ Petition". (Filed via fax.) 03-16044
09/25/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP-NB/MS/MG 03-16069
09/26/2003MotionFiled Response to Motion. ORIGINAL Opposition to "Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief and Motion for Expedited Review of Writ Petition". 03-16044
09/29/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service. 03-16195
10/21/2003RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 03-16109
10/21/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.