judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FIEGEHEN (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42088
Short Caption:FIEGEHEN (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 02CR0056Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:RoseCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/20/2004 at 8:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:10/20/2004How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15931
09/25/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16100
09/26/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: (no date specified). To Court Reporter: Capitol Reporters. 10/02/03 Order: Capitol Reporters shall not take any action upon the transcript request form filed September 26, 2003. 03-16175
10/02/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to file Amended Transcript Request Form. Appellant shall file, within 10 days from the date of this order, an amended transcript request form that substantially complies with NRAP 9(a)(1). Capitol Reporters shall not take any action upon the transcript request form filed September 26, 2003. 03-16376
10/09/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Transcripts. Transcripts requested: 06/27/02, 06/12/03, 06/17/03, 06/23/03, 06/25/03, 06/26/03, 06/30/03, 07/02/03, 07/03/03, 07/07/03, 07/09/03, 07/10/03, 07/11/03, 07/14/03, 07/15/03, and 08/21/03. To Court Reporter: Capitol Reporters. 03-16791
01/06/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 06/23/03; 06/25/03; 06/26/03; 06/27/03; 06/30/03; 07/02/03; 07/03/03; 07/07/03; 07/09/03; 07/10/03; 07/11/03; 07/14/03; 07/15/03. Court Reporter: Mary E. Cameron. 04-00297
01/12/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 8. 04-00719
01/12/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days.
01/13/2004MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 46 pages. 04-00802
01/13/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-00815
01/13/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 08/21/03. Court Reporter: Capitol Reporters. 04-00816
01/15/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Appellant's Appendix). 04-00933
01/16/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/12/03 and 6/17/03. Court Reporter: Mary E. Cameron. 04-00977
02/02/2004MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 15, 2004. 04-02110
02/04/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Stipulation to Enlarge Time). 04-02260
03/10/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-04549
03/10/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 04-04550
03/24/2004MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Transmittal of Original Exhibit 147A and 147B. 04-05513
03/31/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. 04-05997
05/20/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. to Transmit Exhibits. Appellant has moved to supplement the record with 2 trial exhibits, which consist of knives and their sheaths. We conclude that it is premature at this time to determine whether it is necessary for this court to examine the exhibits. Accordingly, we deny the motion. We note that this court may subsequently order the transmission of Exhibits 147-A and 147-B if we later determine that examination of those exhibits is necessary for the resolution of this appeal. 04-09366
08/25/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 20, 2004, at 8:30 a.m. (NNP04-NB/DA/MG)
09/03/2004MotionFiled Motion. Renewed Motion for Transmittal of Original Exhibits 147A and 147B. 04-16152
09/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On May 20, 2004, this court entered an order denying appellant's motion to supplement the record with 2 trial exhibits consisting of knives and their sheaths. Appellant has renewed his motion to supplement the record with those same 2 trial exhibits. We conclude that it is not necessary at this time for the court to examine Exhibits 147A and 147B. We again remind counsel for appellant that in resolving this appeal, if the court deems it necessary, the court on its own volition will direct the district court clerk to transmit Exhibits 147A and 147B to this court. 04-17534
10/05/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
10/20/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP04-NB/DA/MG
02/18/2005OtherDisqualification of Justice Rose.
06/09/2005Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." fn1-[The Honorable Robert Rose, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Gibbons, Mark. Majority: Gibbons/Becker/Maupin/Douglas/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 121 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 30. EN BANC. 05-11326
06/14/2005Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. 05-11688
07/07/2005Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "The petition for rehearing is hereby denied." fn2[The Honorable Robert E. Rose, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in this matter.] NRAP 40(c). EN BANC 05-13427
08/02/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-13796
08/02/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/05/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 4, 2005. 05-13796
08/19/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to the Publishers from Cay Jordan, Editor. Correction on the original opinion: page 14, footnote 18, last line.