judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MOULCHIN (JOSEPHINE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42087
Short Caption:MOULCHIN (JOSEPHINE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C153810Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/23/2004How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15930
10/22/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. See NRAP 11(a)(2) (each complete record shall contain each and every paper, pleading and other document filed, or submitted for filing, in the district court, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings.) fn1[The record shall not include any physical, non-documentary exhibits or the original documentary exhibits filed in the district court, but copies of documentary exhibits submitted in the district court proceedings shall be transmitted as part of the record on appeal. The record shall also include any presentence investigation reports submitted in this matter. The clerk of the district court shall transmit the reports to this court in a sealed envelope identifying the contents and marked confidential.] Nos. 42087/42089/42139/42179/42182 - cases are not consolidated. 03-17542
01/23/2004Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 04-01452
01/23/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/05/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP04D-RR/WM/MD 04-08229
06/02/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-08365
06/02/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/16/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2004. 04-08365