judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PETERSON VS. DOE

Case Information: 42078
Short Caption:PETERSON VS. DOECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9805299Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 03-15751
09/22/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Certified copy of Amended Case Appeal Statement filed in district court on 9/18/03. 03-15833
09/25/2003Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Denying Motion to Proceed on Appeal in Forma Pauperis filed in district court on September 22, 2003. 03-16066
11/20/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Payment of Filing Fee or Compliance with NRAP 24. Appellant shall have 15 days from this order's date to either pay the filing fee or submit a proper NRAP 24(a) motion in this court for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. We caution appellant that if he fails to comply with this order, we may dismiss this appeal as abandoned. 03-19367
01/09/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. To Proceed ing Forma Pauperis. Despite appellant's recent unemployment, we conclude that in forma pauperis status is not warranted in this instance. Appellant's affidavit in support of his motion demonstrates that he has sufficient ability to pay this court's filing fee. Accordingly, appellant shall have 15 days from this order's date within which to pay the filing fee. We caution appellant that if he fails to comply with this order, we may dismiss this appeal as abandoned. 04-00603
02/04/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Donald York Evans. 04-02267
05/06/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. On January 9, 2004, we concluded that in forma pauperis status was not warranted in this appeal, and entered an order denying appellant's motion and directing appellant to pay the filing fee within 15 days. The order also warned appellant that failure to comply could result in dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. Appellant has failed to respond in any way to this court's directive, and the time in which appellant was to have paid the fee expired over three months ago. We conclude that appellant has abandoned this appeal, and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-08438
06/02/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-08461
06/02/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/16/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2004. 04-08461