judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CELTIC INSURANCE CO. VS. HERR

Case Information: 42066
Short Caption:CELTIC INSURANCE CO. VS. HERRCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A439093Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/2003 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Rawlings Olson Cannon Gormley & Desruisseaux--check no. 72547. (Additional $50 due.)
09/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15699
09/19/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. (Additional $50 due.) Due Date: 10 days
09/22/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Additional fee of $50.00 from Rawlings firm - check no. 72568.
09/30/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/06/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16546
10/13/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. M. Nelson Segel. (docketing statement)
02/09/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a tentative settlement of this matter. 04-02492
02/19/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 04-03182
05/19/2004MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. (with prejudice). 04-09303
05/28/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 04-09878
05/28/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.