judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ZIMMERMAN (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42061
Short Caption:ZIMMERMAN (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C192489Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-15689
10/08/2003MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Suspension of Rules Pursuant to NRAP Rule 2. 03-16741
10/08/2003TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 30, 2003 and August 13, 2003. Court Reporter: Lisa Makowski. 03-16742
10/14/2003TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 23, 2003. Court Reporter: Angela Lee. 03-16989
10/27/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-17963
11/07/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On October 8, 2003, appellant's counsel Darin F. Imlay filed a motion to withdraw as counsel in this appeal. The motion is granted. On October 27, 2003, Imlay also filed a motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement in this appeal. The motion is granted. The district court has appointed attorney Shawn Huggins as appellate counsel. Huggins shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix in this appeal. 03-18663
11/19/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Shawn R. Huggins. 03-19280
12/08/2003MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 03-20410
01/21/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On December 8, 2003, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw this appeal voluntarily. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[Because no remittitur will issued in this matter, see NRAP 42(b), the one-year period for filing a post-conviction habeas corpus petition under NRS 34.726(1) shall commence to run from the date of this order.] SNP04S-MS/RR/WM 04-01163
01/21/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.