judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TROCK VS. LAS VEGAS VALLEY WATER DIST.

Case Information: 42080
Short Caption:TROCK VS. LAS VEGAS VALLEY WATER DIST.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A458977Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/01/2003 / England, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/18/2005How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/22/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Greenman Goldberg Raby & Martinez--check no. 54223. (Additional $50 due.)
09/22/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15779
09/22/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. (Additional $50 due.) Due Date: 10 days
10/01/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen L. England. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/02/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Additional $50.00 from Greenman firm - check no. 54361.
10/08/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16750
10/09/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. Kathleen L. England. (Docketing statement)
12/22/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 03-21239
12/31/2003Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 03-21697
01/30/2004Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 04-01968
04/30/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-07946
04/30/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 04-07947
05/28/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. (Employers Ins. Co. of Nevada) 04-09919
05/28/2004AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 04-09920
06/01/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Las Vegas Valley Water District's Answering Brief. 04-10073
07/06/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. 04-12346
03/18/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 05-05314
03/18/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP05--RR/MG/JH
04/21/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP05-RR/MG/JH 05-07715
05/17/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-07790
05/17/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/01/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 19, 2005. 05-07790