judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUKE VS. EL CERRITO PLAZA CO.

Case Information: 42076
Short Caption:DUKE VS. EL CERRITO PLAZA CO.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A448240Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/2003 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Albright Stoddard Warnick & Palmer--check no. 7628.
09/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15742
09/30/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/06/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16571
10/13/2003Notice/Outgoing Letter. M. Nelson Segel. (docketing statement)
12/16/2003Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 10, 2004. 03-20882
05/04/2004MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 04-08130
05/10/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NN/CLK 04-08583
05/10/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
05/11/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. M. Nelson Segel. (stipulation to dismiss appeal)