Case: 13-92-00435-CV
13-92-00435-CV
07/17/1992
Personal Injuries/Damages
Flores, Rolando
Cameron County, Texas; Alex Perez, Sheriff of Cameron County, Texas; Gilbert Salazar and Jose Saldivar, Employees of the Cameron County Sheriff's Department
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/16/1996 | Designation of Attorney | | |
11/08/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/08/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/25/1995 | Cite for opinions | | |
09/21/1995 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
09/21/1995 | Motion to Supplement Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
09/11/1995 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
09/11/1995 | Motion to Supplement | | |
08/24/1995 | Opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction | |
08/24/1995 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
08/24/1995 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
08/24/1995 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
08/24/1995 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/24/1995 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
08/24/1995 | Motion for rehearing granted | | |
08/03/1995 | Motion to extend time to file rehearing disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/01/1995 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
08/01/1995 | Motion for rehearing | | |
07/18/1995 | Additional copy of a letter | | |
07/17/1995 | Letter filed | | |
07/17/1995 | Extension of time to file Mo. for Rehear | | |
07/14/1995 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
06/29/1995 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
03/30/1995 | Supplemental citation | | |
05/26/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
05/12/1994 | Additional Copies of Misc. Motion | | |
05/12/1994 | Sworn Statement filed | | |
05/05/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/04/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
04/19/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
07/07/1993 | Brief received. | | |
06/17/1993 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/04/1993 | Brief received. | | |
06/04/1993 | Motion for leave to file brief | | |
05/27/1993 | Submitted | | |
05/27/1993 | Submission | | |
05/13/1993 | Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT | | |
05/06/1993 | Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT | | |
03/05/1993 | Entry of Judge Selection for Case. | | |
02/18/1993 | Submission | | |
11/16/1992 | Brief Filed | | |
11/16/1992 | Oral argument requested | | |
10/29/1992 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/19/1992 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
09/22/1992 | Brief Filed | | |
09/22/1992 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/22/1992 | Oral argument requested | | |
09/21/1992 | Brief received. | | |
09/17/1992 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/03/1992 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
08/31/1992 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/18/1992 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
07/22/1992 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
07/17/1992 | Transcript Filed | | |
07/17/1992 | Transcript Received | | |
07/17/1992 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/08/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Noe Duenas | No Description Available. | Elizabeth A. Crabb Joel D. Schwartz |
Cameron County, Texas; Alex Pe | Appellee | Hon. J. Arnold Aguilar Hon. Mark E. Sossi Lisa M. Mount |
Ezequiel Torres, Adolfo `Al` | No Description Available. | Carlos Quintana |
Flores, Rolando | Appellant | John F. Hood |
Ezequiel Torres, Adolfo `Al` A | No Description Available. | James D. Selman, III Hon. Francisco J. Rodriguez Daniel Ramirez Hon. Keith C. Livesay |
Trial Court Information
138th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Roberto Garza
90-12-7708-B