judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BROWN (TONY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42072
Short Caption:BROWN (TONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38063
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010527Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 03-15711
09/24/2003Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 03-15968
10/22/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-17628
10/22/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 03-17629
11/12/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 03-18878
11/12/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 03-18880
02/18/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-03143
03/16/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-03410
03/16/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/29/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 18, 2004. 04-03410