judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AHUJA VS. AHUJA

Case Information: 42077
Short Caption:AHUJA VS. AHUJACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9700405Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/17/2003 / King, PatrickSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:04/12/2005 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/12/2005How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of John H. Springgate--check no. 5839.
09/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15746
10/03/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16464
10/16/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Henry Egghart in place of John P. Springgate as counsel for appellant. 03-17238
10/17/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/04/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 04-02265
02/10/2004Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 04-02583
02/20/2004Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/04/98 and 05/27/98. To Court Reporter: Molezzo Reporters. 04-03321
05/07/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to file Transcript. 04-08539
06/09/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-10665
06/09/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 04-10666
06/22/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Opening Brief. 04-11326
06/22/2004Other Other. Received Index to Appellant's Appendix. (Attached to inside front cover of appendix.)
07/08/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-12474
08/10/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. 04-14435
08/30/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Filing Transcripts. On May 7, 2004, appellant filed a motion requesting an extension of time to file the transcripts for this appeal. Submitted under separate cover are certified copies of the April 2, 2003, and April 30, 2003, transcripts. Pursuant to NRAP 9(b), it is the responsibility of the court reporter to file requested transcripts with this court. In the interest of judicial efficiency, we grant appellant's motion for an extension of time. The clerk of this court shall file the transcripts received on May 7, 2004. Because appellant indicates in the motion that the transcripts requested in the February 20, 2004, transcript request form were in error, this court will take no action with respect to that transcript request form. Molezzo Reporters is not obligated to file any transcripts with this court. 04-15669
08/30/2004TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 2, 2003 and April 30, 2003. Court Reporter: Rebecca Martinelli. 04-08540
02/22/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on April 12, 2005, at 9:30 a.m. (NNP05-WM/MD/RP)
03/28/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
04/12/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP05-WM/MD/RP
07/20/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-14421
08/16/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-14548
08/16/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/25/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 18, 2005. 05-14548