judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SALAZAR (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42074
Short Caption:SALAZAR (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C185730Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-15713
09/19/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: May 14, 2003. Court Reporter: Loree Gallegos. Filed in district court on: September 17, 2003. 03-15714
10/08/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-16739
10/08/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 03-16740
10/22/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 03-17631
02/12/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, reversing in Part and Remanding. "We affirm Salazar's convictions for robbery . . . we reverse the conviction for grand larceny auto and remand to the district court to amend the judgment of conviction accordingly." NNP04-NB/DA/MG 04-02746
03/09/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-02918
03/09/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/29/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 11, 2004. 04-02918