judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUBAN PROF'L BLDG. VS. JENNI PLAZA PROPERTY

Case Information: 42062
Short Caption:DUBAN PROF'L BLDG. VS. JENNI PLAZA PROPERTYCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40174
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A439702Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/2003 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/19/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Hagendorf Law Firm, PLLC--check no. 1891.
09/19/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15690
09/29/2003Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 03-16190
09/30/2003Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/02/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 9, 2004. 04-02102
02/13/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. 04-02880
06/04/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 31, 2004. 04-10281
08/05/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 04-14191
10/19/2004Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 04-19303
01/10/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to Comply with NRAP 9(a). To date appellants have failed to comply with our order of October 19, 2004. We again direct appellant to request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a). Appellants shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the appropriate document. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. "MISSING" 05-00445
01/21/2005Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/11/03; 6/9/03; 7/30/03; 8/18/03. To Court Reporter: Free Lance Reporters. 05-01388
02/07/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule and the preparation of transcripts in this appeal are suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellants' response is served. 05-02443
02/15/2005TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 3/11/03; 6/9/03; 7/30/03; 8/18/03. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard, Cindy Caldwell. 05-02969
02/23/2005MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 05-03607
03/03/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. We directed appellants to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. In response, the parties have submitted a stipulation to dismiss the appeal, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. We approve the stipulation and " . . . dismiss this appeal." Each party shall bear its own costs and fees, if any. NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-04180
03/03/2005Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.