judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROMERO (JORGE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42084
Short Caption:ROMERO (JORGE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR021739Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/11/2005 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/11/2005How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 03-15925
09/25/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 03-16091
10/06/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 11, 2003; July 18, 2003; and August 27, 2003; . Court Reporter: Joan Marie Dotson. 03-16636
10/22/2003MotionFiled Motion. Attorney John E. Oakes 03-17537
10/27/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 14, 2003; July 15, 2003; July 16, 2003; and July 17, 2003. Court Reporter: Judith Ann Schonlau. 03-17880
12/01/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Request for Submission of the Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. 03-19939
12/17/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 03-21037
01/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to Withdraw and Remanding for Limited Purpose of Securing Counsel for Appellant. Attorney John E. Oakes has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record for appellant. Mr. Oakes also requests that the Washoe County Public Defender's Office be appointed to represent appellant. Appellant has been served with a copy of the motion and has not opposed the motion. Cause appearing, we grant the motion to withdraw. The clerk shall remove Mr. Oakes as counsel of record for appellant. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order appellant to retain new counsel and cause new counsel to enter a notice of appearance in the district court within 30 days. Within 5 days from the appointment or appearance of counsel, the district court shall: (1) transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order; and (2) serve a copy of this order on appellant's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to file a notice of appearance with the clerk of this court. All filing deadlines, including those set forth in NRAP 9, NRAP 14 and NRAP 31(a)(1), shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required, under this order, to enter an appearance with this court. fn1[In light of this order, we deny, as moot, Mr. Oakes' motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix.] 04-01277
04/05/2004Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on March 30, 2004, appointing Washoe Co. Public Defender as counsel for appellant. 04-06259
04/05/2004Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days
04/15/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Notice of Appearance and Motion for Order Setting Briefing Schedule. 04-06935
05/11/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. On April 5, 2004, the district court filed a copy of an order entered March 30, 2004, that appointed the Washoe County Public Defender's Office as appellate counsel for appellant. On that same date, this court sent a notice establishing a briefing schedule to the Washoe County Public Defender's Office. On April 15, 2004, attorney Richard F. Cornell filed a notice of appearance on behalf of appellant. We conclude that the Washoe County Public Defender's Office is no longer obligated to represent appellant on appeal and we vacate the notice issued April 5, 2004. The clerk shall remove the Washoe County Public Defender's Office as counsel of record for appellant. Appellant has moved for an order setting a briefing schedule. Cause appearing, we grant the motion. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to request transcripts in compliance with NRAP 9(a) and file and serve the docketing statement. Appellant shall have until August 10, 2004, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to attorney Richard F. Cornell, counsel for appellant.) 04-08807
05/14/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-08982
05/14/2004Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 04-09026
05/26/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-09666
05/26/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 5. 04-09667
05/26/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. Attached to inside back cover of original and copies of Opening Brief. 04-09739
06/24/2004Other Other. Received missing pages 16, 17 and 18 to Opening Brief. Attached in proper order in original and copies of brief.
06/28/2004MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 28, 2004. 04-11824
07/28/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-13745
08/09/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. 04-14398
02/22/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on April 11, 2005, at 11:30 a.m. (NNP05-WM/MD/RP)
03/28/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
03/30/2005MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Appellant's Supplemental Authorities. 04/05/05 Order: detached the proposed supplemental authorities from the motion and returned them, unfiled, to appellant. 05-06190
04/05/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for leave to file untimely supplemental authorities. No good cause appearing, we deny the motion. The clerk shall detach the proposed supplemental authorities from the motion and return them, unfiled, to appellant. 05-06654
04/05/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Richard F. Cornell. Detached from the motion filed March 30, 2005 and returned unfiled "Proposed Supplemental Authorities received March 30, 2005."
04/11/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP05-WM/MD/RP
07/11/2005Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP05-WM/MD/RP 05-13642
08/05/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-13824
08/05/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/25/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 9, 2005. 05-13824