judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MORSE (CLARK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 42091
Short Caption:MORSE (CLARK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37940 , 70317 , 70317-COA , 73043 , 73043-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C166187Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/20/2004How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/2003Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/2003Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 03-15937
09/23/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/06/2003TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 8, 2003. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. 03-16644
10/27/2003Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: Trial Beginning 02/26/01(not specific); 07/08/03 and 04/20/01. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. Filed in district court on: 10/01/03. 03-17855
10/27/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 03-17857
10/27/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 03-17858
11/13/2003Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 03-18951
01/27/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. This court has concluded that full briefing of this appeal is warranted. fn1[Counsel need not file a new appendix and may utilize the fast track appendix previously filed in this court. If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, the party must file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. fn2[Neither party has objected to the sufficiency of the rough draft transcripts. Counsel need not file a certified transcript in this appeal as ordinarily required by NRAP 9. But should either counsel object to the sufficiency of the rough draft transcript or cite to transcripts not previously prepared, counsel shall file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts pursuant to NRAP 9(a).] Thereafter, briefing shall proceed as set forth in NRAP 31. 04-01625
01/30/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Briefing. On January 27, 2004, this court ordered the parties to fully brief this appeal. Thereafter, this court issued an opinion in Firestone v. State (Adv. Op. No. 3, January 30, 2004). It appears that this cour5t's decision in Firestone may be relevant to the resolution of this appeal. The briefs to be submitted by the parties shall discuss the applicability of this court's holding in Firestone to the facts of this case. 04-01989
02/26/2004MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: March 24, 2004. 04-03662
03/25/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request). 04-05583
04/08/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed March 25, 2004. Appellant shall have until April 14, 2004, to file and serve the opening brief. 04-06543
04/15/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Third Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to file Appellant's Opening Brief and for Permission to Proceed with Appeal without the Benefit of Trial Transcripts. 04-06927
04/30/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed April 15, 2004. Appellant shall have until May 5, 2004, to file and serve the opening brief. We note that the motion's title states that permission is being sought to proceed without trial transcripts. It appears that this may be a clerical error because the body of the motion does not address this request. Accordingly, this court will take no action on appellant's request 'to Proceed with Appeal Without the Benefit of Trial Transcripts.' 04-07926
05/06/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. 04-08339
05/06/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 04-08340
06/02/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. 04-10146
07/20/2004Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed.
10/06/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP04DRR/WM/MD 04-18507
11/02/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-18560
11/02/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/01/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 8, 2004. 04-18560