judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4835
B-4835
08/24/1974
Application for Writ of Error
THOMAS W. RATTERREE
UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/14/1975Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/26/1974Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/12/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
08/28/1974Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/19/1975Response to Motion filed
03/14/1975Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/26/1974Reply to Response
09/12/1974Response to Petition
08/28/1974Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/24/1974Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Thomas W. RatterreePetitioner
United Services Automobile Association Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information