Case: 08-16-00041-CV
08-16-00041-CV
03/02/2016
Injunction
Salomon Herrera
Wells Fargo, N.A. and Respco, L.L.C.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/13/2016 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||||
04/06/2016 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||||
03/23/2016 | Submitted | | |||||||||
03/22/2016 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||||||
03/11/2016 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||||||
03/09/2016 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||||
03/02/2016 | Court fee due |
| |||||||||
03/02/2016 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/13/2016 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Herrera, Salomon | Appellant | Hon. Joseph D. Vasquez |
Wells Fargo, N.A., Respco, L.L.C. | Appellee | Hon. Susan Forbes |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 5
El Paso
Honorable Linda Chew
2015-DCV4010
Rosie Moreno